+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/21/2021
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 8, 2021 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/8/2021
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor