+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in Calendars
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred directly to s/c on Manufacturing by chair
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed