+ − Actions (17)
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Left pending in subcommittee
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 27, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee members named
- Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor