+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/8/2021
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Elections
- Read first time
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Filed