+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
- Read first time
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
- Correction in referral
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed