+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 29, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor