+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Laid before the Senate
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
On May 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/17/2019
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Reported engrossed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/2/2019
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Land & Resource Management
- Read first time
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Governor
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor