+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed