+ − Actions (14)
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 2, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor