+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Removed from local & uncontested calendar
- Not again placed on intent calendar
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Filed