+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/19
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/17/2019
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/23/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Land & Resource Management
- Read first time
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Governor
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor