+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 4, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment
- Amendment withdrawn
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/3/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor