+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/12/2021
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
- Read first time
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor