+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to suspend regular order of business
- Motion withdrawn
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/21/2021
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
- Read first time
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 8, 2021 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/13/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Governor
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor