+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (58)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Laid before the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Posting rule suspended
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Amended
- Passed as amended
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Referred to Economic Development
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Point of order overruled
- Read 2nd time
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed