+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/15
- Filed without the Governor's signature
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 17, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Record vote
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed