+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On November 12, 2012 in the House:
- Filed