+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/21
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/18/2021
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/31/2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Corrections
- Read first time
On November 9, 2020 in the House:
- Filed