+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor