+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor