+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor