+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/19
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/7/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Business & Commerce
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/20/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Filed