+ − Actions (34)
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amendment amended
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment adopted as amended
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor