+ − Actions (12)
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor