+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor