+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/17
- Filed without the Governor's signature
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Read first time
- Referred to Administration
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Governor
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor