+ − Actions (53)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 23, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On May 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 2, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Filed