+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor