+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (56)
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed without the Governor's signature
- Effective on 9/1/17
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 29, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 28, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Record vote
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on intent calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Passed
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
On May 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor