+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On June 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 18, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Government Organization
- Read first time
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform
- Read first time
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor