+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred directly to s/c on Manufacturing by chair
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor