+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Considered in Calendars
- Vote reconsidered in committee
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed