+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor