+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed