+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Left pending in committee
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Governor
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor