+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 8, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Companion considered in lieu of
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/13/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Land & Resource Management
- Read first time
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Governor
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor