+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as amended
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
- Read first time
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On November 14, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor