+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/20/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Filed