+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (56)
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed without the Governor's signature
- Effective immediately
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Posting rule suspended
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Called from the table
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- 1 legislative day notice-to call from table
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Committee substitute considered in s/c
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred directly to s/c on Bond Indebtedness by chair
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Investments & Financial Services
- Read first time
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Governor
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor