+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (54)
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Not again placed on intent calendar
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Filed