+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Corrections
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor