+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on2/27/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On January 2, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (51)
Type:
Primary Sponsor