+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Considered in Calendars
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Withdrawn from schedule
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On December 14, 2012 in the House:
- Filed