+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/17
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Health & Human Services
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On November 14, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor