+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor