+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Committee substitute considered in s/c
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor