+ − Actions (28)
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 17, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Correction in referral
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On November 18, 2008 in the House:
- Filed