+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Laid out as postponed business
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Postponed
- Record vote
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Committee substitute considered in s/c
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed