+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor