+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Reported engrossed
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 8, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/20/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor